U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Rodgers v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Honor Farm Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Letter(s)]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 03, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • November 17, 2015: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • November 17, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • November 16, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 16, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Mail Returned]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Financial Entry]
  • October 22, 2015: [Response]
  • October 15, 2015: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • October 13, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • October 13, 2015: [Strike]
  • October 07, 2015: [Response]
  • October 07, 2015: [Default Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 23, 2015: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • September 01, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • August 05, 2015: [Waiver of Service Issued]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.