U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Lane v. Barney
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • November 06, 2020: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 16, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 11, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • September 11, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 11, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 11, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • August 25, 2015: [Disqualify]
  • August 25, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 07, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 05, 2015: [Dismiss]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
  • July 21, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2015: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.