U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Plumbers and Pipefitters Health and Security Fund et al v. Bridger Mechanical Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 15, 2015: [Default Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • September 17, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • September 16, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 11, 2015: [Entry of Default]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2015: [Praecipe]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 24, 2015: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.