U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Plumbers and Pipefitters Health and Security Fund et al v. Rawhide Mechanical Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 06, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Status Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Status Report]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 07, 2016: [Reply to Response]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2016: [Show Cause]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Vacating Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 20, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 20, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 20, 2015: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 22, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order]
  • August 21, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 24, 2015: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.