U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Helm v. Old West Oil Field Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 29, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 29, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 23, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 16, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Reply]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • August 26, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 12, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 09, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 01, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Strike]
  • July 08, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 08, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Brief]
  • June 24, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 24, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 10, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Financial Entry]
  • October 26, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • October 13, 2015: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 28, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 14, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 14, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 24, 2015: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.