U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Wei v. University of Wyoming School of Pharmacy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • January 11, 2016: [Set Aside]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Pretrial Memorandum]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 20, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 07, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 04, 2015: [Waiver of Service Issued]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 31, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 31, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.