U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Wieloh v. Bank of America NA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Opposition]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 25, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 25, 2015: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 25, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2015: [Removal]
  • August 19, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • August 18, 2015: [Opposition]
  • August 18, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 04, 2015: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 31, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.