U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Herrera et al v. Buckingham et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 27, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 22, 2020: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 17, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 29, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 29, 2017: [Dismissing Party]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 23, 2017: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2017: [Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 02, 2017: [Response]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Show Cause]
  • January 31, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 27, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 20, 2016: [Expedite]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 26, 2016: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • September 23, 2016: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • September 23, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 23, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 20, 2016: [Response]
  • September 20, 2016: [Reply]
  • September 19, 2016: [Show Cause]
  • September 16, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 16, 2016: [Response]
  • September 15, 2016: [Response]
  • September 15, 2016: [Expedite]
  • September 15, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 15, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 15, 2016: [Opposition]
  • September 14, 2016: [Response]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 13, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Opposition]
  • September 07, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • September 01, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 31, 2016: [Sanctions]
  • August 31, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 30, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Strike]
  • August 22, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 17, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2016: [Response]
  • June 16, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Compel]
  • June 14, 2016: [Expedite]
  • June 14, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • June 14, 2016: [Opposition]
  • June 10, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 06, 2016: [Response]
  • June 03, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Opposition]
  • June 01, 2016: [Supplement]
  • June 01, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Compel]
  • May 26, 2016: [Quash]
  • May 25, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 18, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 10, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • April 21, 2016: [Expedite]
  • April 04, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • April 01, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 17, 2016: [Protective Order]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • February 19, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 17, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
  • February 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 02, 2016: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • February 02, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 29, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 25, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 22, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 22, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 22, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 15, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 11, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • January 08, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • January 08, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 05, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • January 04, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Opposition]
  • December 21, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 17, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 16, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 08, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 05, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 23, 2015: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • October 14, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 01, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 09, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 28, 2015: [Crossclaim]
  • August 27, 2015: [Response]
  • August 27, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 19, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.