U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Kehler v. Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Entry]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 09, 2017: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • February 13, 2017: [Status Report Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Dismiss Party]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • December 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Appeal of Magistrate Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • December 09, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • December 09, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 09, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • December 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 18, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 18, 2016: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • November 18, 2016: [In Limine]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 12, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • October 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • September 29, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 28, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 28, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 27, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • September 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 27, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 26, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 23, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply]
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 23, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 22, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [Response]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • September 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 16, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 15, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 14, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • September 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order]
  • September 02, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 02, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 01, 2016: [Reply]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Reply]
  • August 25, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 18, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 11, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • August 11, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 10, 2016: [Strike]
  • August 04, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • July 26, 2016: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 19, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 08, 2016: [Strike]
  • July 07, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 05, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • June 28, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • June 13, 2016: [Strike]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 05, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 09, 2016: [Opposition]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Protective Order]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 12, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 13, 2015: [Response]
  • October 06, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • October 06, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 22, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 22, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 22, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 31, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 31, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • August 25, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • August 18, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 06, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 05, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 05, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • August 05, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.