U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Parkhurst v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 30, 2015: [Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 05, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 06, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • August 06, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.