U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Hansen et al v. Sublette County Weed and Pest Conrtrol District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 27, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 17, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 01, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 01, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 17, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 27, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 06, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 03, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Strike]
  • July 14, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 09, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Designation]
  • June 03, 2016: [Witness List]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 16, 2016: [Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 11, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 09, 2015: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 19, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 19, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 07, 2015: [Jury Demand]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.