U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Colorado Hospitality Service v. Essex Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 13, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 28, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 30, 2016: [Witness List]
  • June 29, 2016: [Witness List]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 26, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 23, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 22, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 12, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 10, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 25, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 22, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2015: [Removal]
  • August 07, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • August 07, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.