U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Central Bank and Trust v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Reply Brief]
  • October 12, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • September 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 23, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 14, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.