U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Orr v. C.R England Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 14, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2017: [Status Report]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 16, 2017: [Vacate]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 06, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • March 01, 2017: [In Limine]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Vacate]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 09, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 21, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 14, 2016: [Vacate]
  • December 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 12, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 05, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Witness List]
  • June 09, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 02, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 27, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 29, 2015: [Vacate]
  • December 03, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 04, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 03, 2015: [Reply to Response]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 13, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 01, 2015: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 14, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 14, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • August 14, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.