U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Hebert v. Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Receipt for Exhibits]
  • May 02, 2018: [Receipt for Exhibits]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • March 02, 2017: [Reply Brief]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 15, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • February 14, 2017: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • February 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 07, 2017: [Jury Verdict]
  • February 07, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • February 06, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • February 03, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • February 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • February 02, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • February 02, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • February 01, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • February 01, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • February 01, 2017: [Deposition]
  • February 01, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 01, 2017: [Peremptory Challenges]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • January 31, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • January 31, 2017: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • January 23, 2017: [Statement]
  • January 23, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 23, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 13, 2016: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • October 11, 2016: [Response]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 07, 2016: [Objection]
  • October 05, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Strike]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 27, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 23, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 16, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 09, 2016: [In Limine]
  • September 07, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [In Limine]
  • August 29, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 26, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 11, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 09, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 22, 2016: [Objection]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • April 14, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2016: [Continue (Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 25, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 16, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 03, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.