U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Rich Dad Operating Company LLC v. Rich Global LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 29, 2015: [USCA Notification]
  • October 28, 2015: [Transcript Letter]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Statement]
  • September 17, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • September 17, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 17, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 16, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • August 18, 2015: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.