U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00141
  • Case Name: James v. Rocky Mountain Recovery Systems Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 17, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Brief]
  • November 25, 2015: [Strike]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 06, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 06, 2015: [Counterclaim]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 19, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.