U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Watkins v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 25, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 25, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 12, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • January 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Joinder]
  • December 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 22, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 22, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 23, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 17, 2015: [Response]
  • November 16, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Joinder]
  • November 06, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 05, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 26, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 13, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 07, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 17, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.