U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00083
  • Case Name: King v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [USCA Order]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [USCA Order]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • March 21, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 09, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 16, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 12, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 11, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • February 11, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 11, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 11, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • December 03, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 03, 2015: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 30, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 30, 2015: [Response]
  • October 19, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • October 16, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.