U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Johnson v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2018: [Leave to]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Consent Decree]
  • May 06, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Status Report]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 27, 2016: [Stay Case]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 21, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 16, 2015: [Stay Case]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 30, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • September 03, 2015: [Errata]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 27, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 27, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 27, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 27, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • August 27, 2015: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.