U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00134
  • Case Name: DeMillard v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Medium Correctional Institute Warden e
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [USCA Order]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 25, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 05, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2015: [USCA Notification]
  • December 14, 2015: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • December 07, 2015: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • December 03, 2015: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 03, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 02, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 23, 2015: [Reconsideration]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Financial Entry]
  • September 22, 2015: [Dismissing Case]
  • September 16, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 11, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 11, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.