U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Lundquist v. Whitted et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 12, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 23, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • May 13, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Strike]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 28, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 26, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.