U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Laakso et al v. Volvo Cars of North America LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 04, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • March 03, 2017: [- Non Public Document]
  • March 03, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • March 03, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [- Non Public Document]
  • January 30, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • January 30, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 24, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 23, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Minute Order]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Protective Order]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • February 10, 2016: [New Trial]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 01, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 10, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 05, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 14, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2015: [Complaint]
  • September 02, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 02, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order]
  • September 02, 2015: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.