U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Bird v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [USCA Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 25, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • January 21, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 12, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 12, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 08, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Reply to Response]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 26, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2015: [Response]
  • October 19, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 06, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • September 03, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.