U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Rigler v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Letter(s)]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • July 03, 2017: [Letter(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Letter(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Letter(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 13, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • December 12, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • December 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 29, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2016: [Letter(s)]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Affidavit]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Letter(s)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Letter(s)]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 05, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • July 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Recusal]
  • June 27, 2016: [Objection]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • June 22, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • June 20, 2016: [Response]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sanctions]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 02, 2016: [Response]
  • June 01, 2016: [Strike]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2016: [Reply]
  • May 19, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • May 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Response]
  • May 02, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Objection]
  • April 05, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • March 22, 2016: [Stay Discovery]
  • March 22, 2016: [Strike]
  • March 17, 2016: [Response]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Dismissing Party]
  • March 09, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 08, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 07, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 07, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 22, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 20, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 20, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 14, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • January 07, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • January 05, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 04, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Financial Entry]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 19, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order]
  • October 02, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.