U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00155
  • Case Name: Lane v. Buckley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 15, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 15, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 15, 2017: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • November 06, 2017: [Opposition]
  • November 03, 2017: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • November 02, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • November 02, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • October 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 23, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 23, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • October 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 20, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 28, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 27, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 11, 2017: [Opposition]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • July 25, 2017: [Vacating Hearing]
  • July 25, 2017: [Setting Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Opposition]
  • July 21, 2017: [Reply]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • July 14, 2017: [Opposition]
  • July 12, 2017: [Response]
  • July 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 06, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 03, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 03, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • July 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 03, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 22, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 19, 2017: [Add Party]
  • June 07, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 05, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
  • May 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 16, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 12, 2017: [Compel]
  • May 08, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 27, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • February 24, 2017: [Add Party]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • February 10, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • January 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Setting Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Staying Case]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Response]
  • August 01, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Setting Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 12, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 12, 2016: [Strike]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Response]
  • June 13, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 07, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 27, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 27, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 16, 2016: [Show Cause]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2016: [Dismiss]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2016: [Dismiss]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2015: [Opposition]
  • November 04, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 04, 2015: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 04, 2015: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 19, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 19, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 16, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 25, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 18, 2015: [Answer to Notice of Removal]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 18, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • September 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2015: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • September 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 04, 2015: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.