U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Cisneros v. United Parcel Service Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 11, 2016: [Strike]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 08, 2016: [Compel]
  • July 08, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 06, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • July 01, 2016: [Opposition]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Response]
  • June 16, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 09, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 09, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 08, 2016: [Opposition]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 27, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 26, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Objection]
  • May 12, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Protective Order]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 09, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 26, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • October 26, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2015: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • October 14, 2015: [Removal]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.