U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Brenner v. National Outdoor Leadership School
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Transcript Letter]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • November 24, 2015: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • November 16, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 09, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 06, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.