U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00178
  • Case Name: Lundahl et al v. Global E LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2015: [USCA Notification]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 09, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 06, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 13, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 13, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.