U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00179
  • Case Name: Underwood v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Response to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 04, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • October 13, 2015: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2015: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.