U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Teel v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Mail Returned]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Errata]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Mail Returned]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 18, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Compel]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 23, 2016: [Compel]
  • February 23, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 19, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 16, 2016: [Response]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 22, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • January 19, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order]
  • January 07, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 06, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 14, 2015: [Compel]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • November 04, 2015: [Compel]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.