U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Ralph v. Xanterra Parks & Resorts Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • August 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 25, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 24, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 12, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 10, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 27, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Witness List]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • October 20, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.