U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Lundahl et al v. Global E LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • May 13, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 13, 2016: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • May 12, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 11, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 11, 2016: [Objection]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 10, 2016: [Reply]
  • May 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • May 04, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2016: [Opposition]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 27, 2016: [Opposition]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2016: [Opposition]
  • April 26, 2016: [Strike]
  • April 22, 2016: [Opposition]
  • April 20, 2016: [Supplement]
  • April 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • April 19, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 19, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 15, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 13, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 12, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • April 07, 2016: [Reply]
  • April 05, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2016: [Service of Process]
  • April 01, 2016: [Reply]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Response]
  • March 24, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2016: [Opposition]
  • March 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 24, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2016: [Opposition]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 04, 2016: [Remand]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Complaint]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 08, 2016: [Removal]
  • February 04, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Dismissing Case]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.