U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00189
  • Case Name: Cleary v. Wind Quarry LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Enforce Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 02, 2017: [Deposition]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • February 24, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [In Court Hearing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Jury Verdict]
  • January 27, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • January 27, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • January 27, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 27, 2017: [Trial Witness and Exhibit List]
  • January 27, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • January 25, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • January 24, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • January 23, 2017: [Jury Selection]
  • January 23, 2017: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • January 23, 2017: [Response]
  • January 19, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 17, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 17, 2017: [Statement]
  • January 17, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • January 17, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Opposition]
  • December 30, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 16, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 16, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 22, 2016: [Vacating Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Designation]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 18, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 22, 2015: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • December 22, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 17, 2015: [Request for Hearing]
  • December 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 03, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 03, 2015: [Dismiss]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 12, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 10, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 20, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 20, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.