U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00191
  • Case Name: Valyou v. Vannest et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 01, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 29, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 28, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 26, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 26, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • September 23, 2016: [In Limine]
  • September 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • September 15, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 15, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2016: [Response]
  • August 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 19, 2016: [In Limine]
  • August 19, 2016: [Brief]
  • August 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 19, 2016: [Strike]
  • August 18, 2016: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • August 17, 2016: [Enforce Settlement Agreement]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • August 01, 2016: [Witness List]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 26, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 23, 2016: [Compel]
  • May 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 19, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 18, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 02, 2015: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 01, 2015: [Request for Hearing]
  • December 01, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2015: [Jury Demand]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 30, 2015: [Strike]
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 16, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 16, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.