U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00195
  • Case Name: High Plains Community Church v. Brown Church Development Group Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 29, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 17, 2016: [In Limine]
  • October 07, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 06, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 03, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 06, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 03, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2016: [Opposition]
  • May 04, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 29, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • April 29, 2016: [Compel]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 16, 2015: [Transmittal of Documents]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Removal]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 30, 2015: [Complaint]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.