U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00165
  • Case Name: United Fire & Casualty Company v. Growin' Green et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • February 05, 2016: [Mail Returned]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • January 19, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • January 11, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Entry of Default]
  • December 21, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • December 14, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • December 03, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Entry of Default]
  • November 17, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.