U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00196
  • Case Name: BPI Labs Inc v. East Hill Industries Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 09, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 18, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 04, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.