U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Shams v. United States Postal Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 13, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 05, 2015: [Removal]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.