U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Sullivan v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [USCA Notification]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Jury Trial]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • October 07, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 27, 2016: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • September 27, 2016: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • September 12, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 08, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 08, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 07, 2016: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 10, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 01, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • August 01, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 19, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2016: [Response]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 23, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 16, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 06, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • November 05, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.