U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Stapleton v. Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 13, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 06, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.