U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00200
  • Case Name: Starrett v. Lander WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
  • January 06, 2017: [USCA Notification]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 08, 2016: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • November 28, 2016: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • November 23, 2016: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • November 23, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • November 10, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 09, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 04, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • October 20, 2016: [Transmittal of Documents]
  • October 20, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • October 18, 2016: [In Limine]
  • October 18, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 03, 2016: [Exhibit]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 16, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 07, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Witness List]
  • July 21, 2016: [Designation]
  • July 14, 2016: [Response]
  • July 13, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Response]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 08, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 05, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.