U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Crum v. Theorine
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 03, 2017: [Jury Verdict]
  • March 03, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 03, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • March 02, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • March 01, 2017: [Deposition]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 27, 2017: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • February 27, 2017: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • February 27, 2017: [In Court Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • February 23, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 22, 2017: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • February 21, 2017: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • February 17, 2017: [Objection]
  • February 16, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 16, 2017: [Objection]
  • February 13, 2017: [Designation]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • February 13, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 13, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 09, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 08, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 07, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 02, 2017: [Objection]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 31, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 31, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • January 23, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 20, 2017: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2017: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2017: [Reply to Response]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Response]
  • December 29, 2016: [Opposition]
  • December 19, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 16, 2016: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • December 13, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 12, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 03, 2016: [Supplement]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Reply]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 23, 2016: [Opposition]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 19, 2016: [Quash]
  • September 13, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 06, 2016: [Response]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 02, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 09, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 07, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 03, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 03, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 01, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.