U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00202
  • Case Name: Neufer v. Sweetwater County District Judge et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 10, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.