U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00203
  • Case Name: Brown v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • June 07, 2016: [Brief]
  • June 07, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 02, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [Response]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 24, 2015: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 03, 2015: [Response]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Financial Entry]
  • November 13, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 12, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.