U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00204
  • Case Name: Schneider v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 14, 2016: [Supplement]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 01, 2016: [Status Conference]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 05, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 24, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • November 16, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.