U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Swain v. Buel Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 20, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • May 02, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 02, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 14, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 11, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 15, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.