U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00209
  • Case Name: Losey v. Cate Street Capital Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 04, 2016: [Dismiss]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 10, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 10, 2016: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 05, 2016: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • January 05, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 05, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Removal]
  • November 25, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 24, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 23, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 23, 2015: [Complaint]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.