U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00210
  • Case Name: McCarty v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Financial Entry]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 24, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2017: [Vacate]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 26, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 23, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 21, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 20, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 17, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 16, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • January 13, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • January 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 09, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 04, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • January 03, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • January 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 30, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 29, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 09, 2016: [Brief]
  • December 09, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 09, 2016: [Strike]
  • December 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 28, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Response]
  • November 22, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 03, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 01, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Witness List]
  • October 28, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2016: [Status Report]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 26, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 21, 2016: [Quash]
  • September 21, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 19, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 13, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 10, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 10, 2016: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • September 08, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 07, 2016: [Response]
  • September 07, 2016: [Compel]
  • September 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 07, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 07, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 06, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 26, 2016: [Compel]
  • August 26, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • August 25, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [Compel]
  • August 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • May 05, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • April 29, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 28, 2016: [Opposition]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2016: [Bifurcate]
  • April 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 10, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Brief]
  • March 08, 2016: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • February 03, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • February 03, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 20, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 15, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 14, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2015: [Brief]
  • December 14, 2015: [Dismiss Party]
  • December 14, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 08, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.