U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company v. Hopkinson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
  • September 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 30, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 17, 2016: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 13, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 11, 2016: [Counterclaim]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 28, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • December 28, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 24, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • December 24, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 24, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • December 24, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 14, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 25, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • November 25, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 25, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.